VA HB2185 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Rural Information Technology Apprenticeship Grant Fund and Program. Establishes the Virginia Rural Information Technology Apprenticeship Grant Fund and Program, to be administered by the Southwest Virginia Higher Education Center, for the purpose of awarding grants to small, rural information technology businesses in certain localities in the Southwest and Southside regions of Virginia to establish 18-month apprenticeship programs for full-time employees that combine mentorship and on-the-job training to enhance the experience and skills of such employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Rural Information Technology Apprenticeship Grant Fund and Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 647 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2185ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference substitute printed 19107574D-H1
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Chafin, Barker, Dance
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Kilgore, Landes, Hayes
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106931D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2185S1
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106931D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106931D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19101830D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2185E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101830D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2313129.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2185
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2185+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2185E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2185S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2185H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2185ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0647+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0206V0014+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0040+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2317+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0357+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2185+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2185+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3060+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0855HB2185+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3308+HB2185
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1059HB2185+HB2185

Bill Comments

feedback