VA HB2187 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Gas or oil drilling units; escrowed proceeds; Coalfield Region Elderly Assistance Fund; Coalfield Region Tourism Fund. Provides that proceeds of certain gas or oil wells, escrowed because the owner's identity and location remain unknown, shall be presumed abandoned and paid into the Coalbed Region Elderly Assistance Fund (the Elderly Fund), established by the bill. The bill directs the Virginia Gas and Oil Board to make grants to nonprofit organizations for the support of elderly residents of the region. Current law requires such escrowed proceeds to be disposed of pursuant to the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act.
Title
Gas or oil drilling units; escrowed proceeds, Coalfield Region Elderly Assistance Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102706D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 361.21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.21:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.22:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
45 | 1 | 361.22:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |