VA HB2190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund; investments in Virginia Venture Capital Accounts. Authorizes the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission (the Commission) to invest up to 10 percent of its annual disbursements from the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Fund in Virginia venture capital accounts that have been certified by the Department of Taxation.
Title
Tobacco Indemnification & Community Revitalization Fund; investments in Va. Venture Capital Accts.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101912D |