VA HB2192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modernization of public school buildings and facilities. Provides that it is the legislative intent that public school buildings and facilities be designed, constructed, maintained, and operated to generate more electricity than consumed, and allows local school boards to enter into leases with private entities to achieve that goal if the school board owns or operates a school building or facility that has been properly modernized, generates energy derived from sunlight, and if the solar generating facility is properly interconnected. The bill also provides that private entities that contract with local school boards to modernize public school buildings and facilities may receive financing from the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority. This bill is identical to SB 1331. Modernization of public school buildings and facilities. Provides that it is the legislative intent that public school buildings and facilities be designed, constructed, maintained, and operated to generate more electricity than consumed, and allows local school boards to enter into leases with private entities to achieve that goal if the school board owns or operates a school building or facility that has been properly modernized, generates energy derived from sunlight, and if the solar generating facility is properly interconnected. The bill also provides that private entities that contract with local school boards to modernize public school buildings and facilities may receive financing from the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority. This bill is identical to SB 1331.
Title
Public school buildings and facilities; modernization.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0819) | |
2019-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 819 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2192ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 19107053D-S1 (96-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB2192S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stanley agreed to |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107053D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107053D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2192H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106018D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106018D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103166D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 141.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 141.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 198 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 199 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 218.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |