VA HB2195 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage; tipped employees. Increases the cash wage for tipped employees to $3.50 per hour in 2020, $4.75 in 2021, and $6 in 2022. The measure also eliminates the tip credit effective January 1, 2023.
Title
Minimum wage; tipped employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102688D |