VA HB2197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Summary judgment; limited use of discovery depositions and affidavits. Allows for the limited use of discovery depositions and affidavits in support of or in opposition to a motion for summary judgment, provided that the only parties to the action are business entities and the amount at issue is $50,000 or more. This bill is identical to SB 1486.
Title
Summary judgment; limited use of discovery depositions and affidavits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0010) | |
2019-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 13, 2019 | |
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 6, 2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2197ER) |
2019-02-05 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103756D |