VA HB2198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; exempt counties, cities, school boards, and towns with populations greater than 3,500; competitive negotiation for professional services. Requires all counties, cities, and school divisions, and all towns having a population greater than 3,500, in the Commonwealth that are exempt from the provisions of the Virginia Public Procurement Act (the Act) because they have adopted alternative policies and procedures as permitted by law to procure professional services through competitive negotiation as set forth in the Act when the cost of the professional service is expected to exceed $80,000 in the aggregate or for the sum of all phases of a contract or project. Under current law, such counties, cities, and school divisions, and all towns having a population greater than 3,500, are required to procure professional services through competitive negotiation as set forth in the Act when the cost of the professional service is expected to exceed $60,000 in the aggregate or for the sum of all phases of a contract or project.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; exempts counties, cities, etc., with population greater than 3,500.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2198ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103075D |