VA HB2204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: Senate Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Polling place procedures; full residence address of voter not announced. Removes the requirement that the officer of election audibly repeat the address of a voter offering to vote. The bill does not change the requirement for the officer of election to audibly repeat the voter's full name.
Title
Polling place procedures; full name and current residence address of voter.
Sponsors
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Chris Jones [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Recommitted to Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101879D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2204E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101879D |