VA HB2213 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Candidate petitions; requirements, review of signatures, appeals. Provides that independent candidates for office and groups of qualified voters seeking to have slates of electors placed on the presidential ballot have a right to appeal a determination by the State Board of Elections or local electoral board, as the case may be, that their petitions lack the minimum number of signatures of qualified voters required for the particular office. Notice of disqualification must be provided by regular mail or email, and the candidate or group has seven calendar days from the issue of the notice to file an appeal. The State Board is to develop procedures for the conduct of appeals. The bill also reduces the required number of petition signatures from 10,000 statewide and 400 per congressional district to 5,000 statewide and 200 per congressional district for candidates in presidential primaries, independent groups seeking to have slates of electors placed on the presidential ballot, and independent candidates for statewide offices
Title
Candidate petitions; review of signatures, appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13102730D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 543 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2213 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2213+hil |