VA HB2213 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; Small Business Loan Guarantee Fund. Creates the Small Business Loan Guarantee Fund to provide loan loss reserves, interest rate write downs, and loan guarantees for up to 90 percent of the principal amount of any commercial loan or line of credit made by a community bank. The bill provides that such guarantees shall not exceed $200 million or a term of five years.
Title
Small Business Loan Guarantee Fund; created.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in General Laws |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15100612D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2213 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2213+hil |