VA HB2213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Time limit on the receipt of TANF financial assistance. Reduces the total lifetime limit on TANF financial assistance to 24 months, reduces the number of consecutive months a person may receive TANF before a period of ineligibility from 24 to 12 consecutive months, and reduces the time period of ineligibility from 24 months to 12 consecutive months.
Title
TANF; time limit on receipt of financial assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 10-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100918D |