VA HB2213 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Exchange of medical and mental health information and records of person committed to jail; local probation officers. Adds local probation officers to the list of persons among whom the medical and mental health information and records of any person committed to jail, and transferred to another correctional facility, may be exchanged.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical & mental health information/records of person committed to jail; local probation officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2213ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106760D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2213S1
2019-02-12SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 19106760D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateFloor substitute printed 19106760D-S1 (Surovell)
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-24HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-24HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-22HouseRead first time
2019-01-18HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104100D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531133.03(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2213
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2213+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2213S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2213ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0702+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0001+HB2213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0003+HB2213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1815+HB2213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1829+HB2213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0088+HB2213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB2213+HB2213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0520HB2213+HB2213
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2833+HB2213

Bill Comments

feedback