VA HB2215 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0222)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Required immunizations; acellular pertussis booster. Extends the time by which an acellular pertussis booster shall be administered from prior to entry into the sixth grade to prior to entry into the seventh grade.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immunizations; acellular pertussis booster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0222)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 222 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2215ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101795D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32146(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback