VA HB2220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Special license plate; Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal. Creates a special license plate for persons awarded the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal or for unremarried surviving spouses of such persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License plates, special; Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0194)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 194 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2220ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2220H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105560D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105560D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100688D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462745.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2220
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2220+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2220H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2220ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0194+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1903V0011+HB2220
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0031+HB2220
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1977+HB2220
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2023+HB2220
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0129+HB2220
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2220+HB2220
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2220+HB2220

Bill Comments

feedback