VA HB2222 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; display of advertising material on school buses. Permits local school boards to display (i) commercial advertising material on the sides of school buses between the rear wheels and the rear of the bus, provided that no such material (a) obstructs the name of the school division or the number of the school bus; (b) is sexually explicit; or (c) pertains to alcohol, food or beverages that do not meet the nutrition standards developed by the U.S. Department of Agriculture pursuant to the federal Healthy, Hunger-Free Kids Act of 2010 or any additional state or local nutrition standards for food or beverages sold to students in school, gambling, politics, or tobacco and (ii) school-related advertising material, including advertising material relating to school events and school board employment opportunities, on the sides of school buses between the rear wheels and the rear of the bus, provided that no such material obstructs the name of the school division or the number of the school bus.
Title
School boards, local; display of advertising material on school buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 29-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 29-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102406D-E |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2222E |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102406D |