VA HB2223 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacies; delivery of prescription drugs; pharmacy benefits managers. Requires health every carrier, as applicable, to administer its health benefit plans in a manner consistent with, or include in contracts for pharmacy benefits management, criteria and provisions that (i) permit a covered individual to fill any mail order-covered prescription, at the covered individual's option, at any mail order pharmacy or network participating retail community pharmacy if the network participating retail community pharmacy agrees to accept a price that is comparable to that of the mail order pharmacy, calculated to reflect all drug manufacturer's rebates, direct and indirect administrative fees, costs and any remuneration; (ii) prohibit a pharmacy benefits manager (PBM) or carrier from imposing a differential copayment, additional fee, or other condition on any covered individual who elects to fill his prescription at an in-network retail community pharmacy that is not similarly imposed on covered individuals electing to fill a prescription from a mail order pharmacy; and (iii) require the PBM to use the same benchmark index to reimburse all pharmacies participating in the health benefit plan regardless of whether a pharmacy is a mail order pharmacy or a retail community pharmacy. The measure applies with respect to contracts entered into, amended, extended, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020.
Title
Pharmacies; delivery of prescription drugs, pharmacy benefits managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 8-N) (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 8-N) (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health with letter (11-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 46-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2223H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106247D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106247D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 8-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103343D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.15:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3420.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |