VA HB2228 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Composition of the Boards of Nursing and Psychology; health regulatory boards; staggered terms. Alters the composition of the Board of Nursing and replaces the requirement that the Board of Nursing meet each January with the requirement that it meet at least annually. The bill also removes specific officer titles from the requirement that the Board of Nursing elect officers from its membership. The bill replaces the requirement that a member of the Board of Psychology be licensed as an applied psychologist with the requirement that that position be filled by a member who is licensed in any category of psychology. The bill also provides a mechanism for evenly staggering the terms of members of the following health regulatory boards, without affecting the terms of current members: Board of Nursing, Board of Psychology, Board of Dentistry, Board of Long-Term Care Administrators, Board of Medicine, Board of Veterinary Medicine, Board of Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology, Board of Pharmacy, and Board of Counseling.
Title
Nursing and Psychology, Boards of; health regulatory boards, staggered terms.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 169 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2228ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101801D |