VA HB2232 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motorized skateboards or foot-scooters; operation; local authority. Authorizes localities to prohibit or regulate the operation of companies providing motorized skateboards or foot-scooters for hire. The bill authorizes localities to regulate certain aspects of the operation of motorized skateboards and foot-scooters. The bill changes the definition of motorized skateboard or foot-scooter by (i) removing the requirement that such device have no manufacturer-issued vehicle identification number, (ii) removing the requirement that the motor or engine be of a certain maximum power, (iii) providing that such device weighs less than 100 pounds and has a maximum speed of no more than 20 miles per hour, and (iv) providing that such device may be powered in whole or in part by the motor or engine. The bill makes consistent the operational requirements for motorized skateboards or foot-scooters and similar devices, including (a) allowing motorized skateboards and foot-scooters to be driven on sidewalks, (b) requiring motorized skateboards and foot-scooters driven on a roadway to be driven as close to the right curb as is safely practicable, (c) prohibiting the operation of motorized skateboards or foot-scooters on any Interstate Highway System component, and (d) requiring operators of motorized skateboards and foot-scooters to give hand signals and have lights on such vehicle.
Title
Motorized skateboards or foot-scooters; operation, local authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104321D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1041 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1081 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 849 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 908.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |