VA HB2238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Previously unidentified cemeteries. Adds the category of previously unidentified cemetery to the laws allowing for the removal of remains from graveyards or family cemeteries that have been abandoned or are unused and neglected by their owners. The bill includes technical amendments.
Title
Cemeteries; removal of remains, etc., of previously unidentified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0195) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 195 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2238ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102311D |