VA HB2249 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord charges for security deposits, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance; filing of information regarding resident agent appointed by nonresident property owner. Prohibits a landlord from requiring a tenant to pay a security deposit, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance prior to the commencement of the tenancy that exceed the amount of two months' periodic rent. The bill permits a landlord, however, to add a monthly amount as additional rent to recover additional costs of such renter's insurance premiums. The bill also removes provisions allowing a landlord to permit a tenant to provide damage insurance coverage in lieu of the payment of a security deposit. Finally, the bill requires nonresident property owners to file the name and office address of the agent appointed by such nonresident property owner in the office of the clerk of the State Corporation Commission. Under current law, such information must be filed in the office of the clerk of the court in which deeds are recorded in the county or city in which the property lies. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord charges for security deposits, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance; filing of information regarding resident agent appointed by nonresident property owner. Prohibits a landlord from requiring a tenant to pay a security deposit, insurance premiums for damage insurance, and insurance premiums for renter's insurance prior to the commencement of the tenancy that exceed the amount of two months' periodic rent. The bill permits a landlord, however, to add a monthly amount as additional rent to recover additional costs of such renter's insurance premiums. The bill also removes provisions allowing a landlord to permit a tenant to provide damage insurance coverage in lieu of the payment of a security deposit. Finally, the bill requires nonresident property owners to file the name and office address of the agent appointed by such nonresident property owner in the office of the clerk of the State Corporation Commission. Under current law, such information must be filed in the office of the clerk of the court in which deeds are recorded in the county or city in which the property lies.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord charges for security deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2249H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103524D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103524D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102708D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2249 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 1 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |