VA HB2258 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child day programs; staff training requirements; exemption for cooperative preschools. Exempts parents and other persons who participate in a cooperative preschool center on behalf of a child attending such cooperative preschool center, including such parents and persons who are counted for the purpose of determining staff-to-child ratios, from orientation and training requirements applicable to staff of child day programs. The bill provides that such exempt parents may be required to complete up to four hours of training per year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child day programs; staff training requirements, exemption for cooperative preschools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0604)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 604 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2258ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103912D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321734(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2258
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2258+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2258ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0604+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0008+HB2258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0037+HB2258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1979+HB2258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2025+HB2258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0101+HB2258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2258+HB2258
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2258+HB2258

Bill Comments

feedback