VA HB2261 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Paid medical and family leave for employees; civil penalties. Requires employers with 15 or more employees to provide to each employee paid medical and family leave at a rate of 0.46 hours per 40 hours worked, up to 24 hours in any 12-month period. The measure caps the amount of paid family leave that an employee may accrue at any time at 24 hours and provides that any paid medical and family leave awarded to an employee that is not used within one year is forfeited. The measure provides that existing employees will commence receiving such leave on July 1, 2019, and new employees will commence receiving such leave after they have worked for their employer for 90 days. The bill would require an employer to pay the employee for leave taken, up to the amount of the employee's medical and family leave balance, for a purpose for which the employee would be entitled to unpaid leave under the federal Family and Medical Leave Act. The measure does not require employers to compensate employees for unused medical and family leave upon termination of employment. The measure requires the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to administer and enforce these requirements and to investigate alleged violations of these requirements. The measure authorizes the Commissioner to impose a civil penalty of not more than $1,000 for a violation.
Title
Employees; paid medical and family leave, civil penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101738D |