VA HB2266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; confirmation of citizenship; E-Verify program. Requires the Department of Elections to apply to participate in the E-Verify program operated by the U.S. Department of Homeland Security in partnership with the Social Security Administration for the purpose of verifying that voters listed in the Virginia voter registration system are United States citizens. General registrars are required to use information obtained from the program to determine the eligibility of persons registering to vote when the citizenship status of an applicant is in question and to remove from the voter registration rolls those individuals found to not be citizens of the United States.
Title
Voter registration; confirmation of citizenship, E-Verify program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102702D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 404.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |