VA HB2270 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - (66 affirmative votes required to override veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Release of certain incarcerated aliens from jail; notice to Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Requires that the sheriff, jail superintendent, or other official in charge of a local correctional facility or a regional jail in which an alien is incarcerated shall notify U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the release or discharge of the alien forthwith as soon as the release date is known.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incarcerated aliens, certain; release from jail, notice to Immigration and Customs Enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 7-N) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03House(66 affirmative votes required to override veto)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (50-Y 48-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (50-Y 48-N)
2019-03-19 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2270ER)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 46-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19102731D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2270E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment Courts of Justice agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments from Militia, Police and Public Safety agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 7-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-18HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (11-Y 9-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102731D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531220.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2270
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2270+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2270E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2270ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0002+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0004+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0804V0010+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0126+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2473+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0292+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2270+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0765HB2270+HB2270
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3428+HB2270

Bill Comments

feedback