VA HB2273 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (8-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (8-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Use of handheld personal communications devices in certain motor vehicles while passing stopped school bus; penalty. Imposes a mandatory fine of $250 for using a handheld personal communications device for reading emails or texting while operating a motor vehicle and passing a stopped school bus.
Title
Handheld personal communications devices; use while passing stopped school bus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (8-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2273H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105466D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105466D-H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100523D |