VA HB2280 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Child day programs; exemptions from licensure. Adds to the list of programs that are not considered child day programs and are not subject to licensure (i) programs of recreational activities offered by a local government, staffed by local government employees, and attended by school-age children and (ii) programs offered by a local school division, operated for no more than four hours per day, staffed by local school division employees, and attended by children who are at least four years of age and are enrolled in public school or a preschool program within such school division. Under law that takes effect July 1, 2019, such programs are considered child day programs that are exempt from licensure and subject to certain health and safety requirements administered by the Department of Social Services. Under the provisions of the bill, however, such child day programs shall remain subject to safety and supervisory standards established by the local government or school division offering the program.
Title
Child day programs; exemptions from licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N) (Y: 7 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103931D |