VA HB2282 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gas severance tax. Eliminates the expiration date for the local gas severance tax that is dedicated to (i) the local Coal and Gas Road Improvement Fund, (ii) the Virginia Coalfield Economic Development Fund, and (iii) water, sewer, and natural gas systems and lines.
Title
Gas severance tax; eliminates expiration date for tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1705-Morefield) by voice vote |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103216D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1705 (Similar To) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2282 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2282+hil |