VA HB2282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Issuance of temporary licenses; individuals engaged in counseling residency. Directs the Board of Counseling to promulgate emergency regulations for the issuance of temporary licenses to individuals engaged in a counseling residency so that they may acquire the supervised, postgraduate experience required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Issuance of temporary licenses; individuals engaged in counseling residency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2282ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2282H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105443D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105443D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101865D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413505(n/a)See Bill Text
5413506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2282
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2282+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2282H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2282ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0428+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0006+HB2282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0031+HB2282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1981+HB2282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2027+HB2282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0288+HB2282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2282+HB2282
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2282+HB2282

Bill Comments

feedback