VA HB2285 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tourism zones; tax revenues for tourism projects. Entitles certain tourism projects to a percentage of the state and local sales tax revenues generated on the premises of the project, to be used towards debt service to bridge the gap between available debt and equity and the expected costs of the project. In order to qualify for the entitlement, the project must have at least 80 percent of the funding for the project in place. If a locality passes an ordinance adopting a tourism plan and identifies by ordinance a tourism project that meets a deficiency in the plan, and the State Comptroller certifies the project, then the project is entitled to one percent of the state sales tax generated on the premises of the project. The locality must also provide, by ordinance, one percent of the local sales generated on the premises, and the tourism project must provide a match for the one percent state sales tax revenue.
Title
Tourism zones; tax revenues for tourism projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (68-Y 22-N) (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (68-Y 22-N) (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 814 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2285ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 16-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (82-Y 16-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2285ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (68-Y 22-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105241D-S1 (68-Y 22-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2285S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105241D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105241D-S1 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2285H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104855D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104855D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 4-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102731D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1193 (Same As) 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)