VA HB2285 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing access to firearms by minors; penalty. Provides that any person who negligently leaves a loaded, unsecured firearm in such a manner as to endanger the life or limb of any person under the age of 18 is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Current law provides that any person who recklessly leaves a loaded, unsecured firearm in such a manner as to endanger the life or limb of any child under the age of 14 is guilty of a Class 3 misdemeanor.
Title
Firearms; allowing access by minors, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102156D |