VA HB2292 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; energy efficiency programs. Provides that any determination by the State Corporation Commission that an energy efficiency program is not in the public interest shall include with its final order the work product and analysis conducted by the staff of the Commission in making that determination. The measure requires that if the Commission reduces the proposed budget for a program or portfolio of programs, its final order shall include an analysis of the impact such budget reduction has upon the cost-effectiveness of such program or portfolio of programs. An order by the Commission (i) finding that a program or portfolio of programs is not in the public interest or (ii) reducing the proposed budget for any program or portfolio of programs shall adhere to existing protocols for extraordinarily sensitive information. The measure provides that any utility petitioning the Commission for approval of one or more rate adjustment clauses for energy efficiency programs shall include a proposed budget for the design, implementation, and operation of the energy efficiency programs. The bill requires that any rate adjustment clause approved for an energy efficiency program remain in effect until the utility exhausts the approved budget for the energy efficiency program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; definitions, energy efficiency programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2292ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106660D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2292S1
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106660D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106660D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2292H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105519D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105519D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102467D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2292
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2292+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2292H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2292S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2292ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0741+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1403V0011+HB2292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0032+HB2292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2380+HB2292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0139+HB2292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2292+HB2292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0656HB2292+HB2292
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2907+HB2292

Bill Comments

feedback