VA HB2301 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (6-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (6-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops. Creates a new limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops and sets out the privileges of this new license, including a requirement that at least 60 percent of the licensee's annual gross revenue be from the sale of premium tobacco products. The bill defines "cigar shop" and sets out the state and local license taxes for this license.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; creates retail cigar shop license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (6-Y 9-N) (Y: 6 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (6-Y 9-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2301H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105082D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105082D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101790D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2821 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |