VA HB2305 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sections not set out in Code of Virginia. Sets out sections in Title 15.2 that are currently carried by reference only. Locality descriptions are replaced with locality names, and various technical amendments are made. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Localities; descriptions are replaced with locality names.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0632)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 632 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2305ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2305H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105628D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105628D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104295D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521128(n/a)See Bill Text
1521130(n/a)See Bill Text
1521201.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521212(n/a)See Bill Text
1521228(n/a)See Bill Text
1522257(n/a)See Bill Text
1524602(n/a)See Bill Text
1524701(n/a)See Bill Text
1524702(n/a)See Bill Text
1524801(n/a)See Bill Text
1525118(n/a)See Bill Text
1525120(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2305
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2305+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2305H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2305ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0632+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0702V0027+HB2305
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0026+HB2305
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2384+HB2305
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0100+HB2305
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2305+HB2305
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2305+HB2305

Bill Comments

feedback