VA HB2310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local flood plain regulation. Authorizes any locality to regulate the activity on, or use or development of, a flood plain in a manner consistent with any state and federal flood plain management programs and requirements. The bill provides that its provisions shall be given retroactive and prospective effect.
Title
Flood plain, local; regulation by localities.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stanley agreed to |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Spruill withdrawn |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (10-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102214D-E |
2019-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2310E |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102214D |