VA HB2314 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Personnel Act; equal pay for equal work; policy of the Commonwealth. Provides that it is the policy of the Commonwealth that there shall be no discrimination between state employees on the basis of sex by paying wages to state employees at a rate less than the rate at which it pays wages to state employees of the opposite sex for equal work on jobs, the performance of which requires equal skill, effort, and responsibility, and which are performed under similar working conditions, except where such payment is made pursuant to (i) a seniority system, (ii) a merit system, (iii) a system that measures earnings by quantity or quality of production, or (iv) a differential based on any other factor other than sex. The bill also requires the Department of Human Resource Management to establish and administer a program to ensure equal pay for equal work to state employees in all incidents of employment as provided in the Virginia Personnel Act. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Personnel Act; equal pay for equal work, policy of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17102375D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |