VA HB2314 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Local enterprise zone; traffic plan. Requires that, upon petition of a locality that has adopted a local enterprise zone development taxation program, the Department of Transportation, in consultation with the Virginia Economic Development Partnership and relevant local economic officials, shall develop a traffic plan to support and encourage the development of businesses located in such program zone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local enterprise zone; development of a traffic plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Finance
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102356D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813245.12(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback