VA HB2320 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Resetting bail, bond, and recognizance determinations; jurisdiction. Provides that any motion to alter the terms and conditions of bail where the initial bail decision is made by a judge or clerk of a district court or by a magistrate on any charge originally pending in that district court shall be filed in that district court unless (i) a bail decision is on appeal, (ii) such charge has been transferred to a circuit court, or (iii) such charge has been certified by a district court. The bill also provides that a bail decision of a higher court from an appeal of a lower court's bail decision shall be remanded to the lower court in which the case is pending for enforcement and modification of bail. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resetting bail, bond, and recognizance determinations; jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 616 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2320ER)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2320H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105764D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105764D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100032D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192124(n/a)See Bill Text
192130(n/a)See Bill Text
192132(n/a)See Bill Text
192186(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2320
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2320+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2320H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2320ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0616+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0085+HB2320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0079+HB2320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2082+HB2320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0282+HB2320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2320+HB2320
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2320+HB2320

Bill Comments

feedback