VA HB2322 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health; plan for oversight and enforcement; requirements governing onsite sewage treatment systems. Directs the Department of Health to develop a plan for the oversight and enforcement by the Department of requirements related to the inspection and pump-out of onsite sewage treatment systems that do not require a Virginia Pollutant Discharge Elimination System permit established pursuant to the Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act and are located in counties eligible for participation in the Rural Coastal Virginia Community Enhancement Authority. The bill requires the Department to present such plan to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and
Title
Onsite sewage treatment systems; VDH shall develop a plan for oversight and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 429 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2322ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102316D-E |
2019-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2322E |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102316D |