VA HB2323 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Information technology projects and services in the Commonwealth. Clarifies responsibilities related to information technology in the Commonwealth. The bill provides the Chief Information Officer (CIO) with the authority to approve and make decisions related to information technology projects, procurements, and standards without requiring the routine approval of the Secretary of Technology. The bill provides that the Secretary of Technology is responsible for overseeing enterprise information technology projects and communicating regularly with the Governor and other Secretaries regarding information technology services, initiatives, and investments in the Commonwealth. The bill also requires that agency and department heads follow policies and procedures put in place by the CIO regarding the security of government information and establishes requirements ensuring that procurement provisions are followed regarding the purchase of information technology. The changes in the bill are recommendations of the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission.
Title
Information technology projects and services; Chief Information Officer authorized to approve.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #9, #10 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 67-N) (Y: 31 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 68-N) (Y: 30 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 67-N) (Y: 31 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 68-N) (Y: 30 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768) | |
2015-04-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 768 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2323ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #9, #10 (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #10 (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 67-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 1-8 and 11-28 (31-Y 67-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #'s 1-8 and 10-28 agreed to |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #9 (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (30-Y 68-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 1-8 and 10-28 (30-Y 68-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2323ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2323H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104714D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104714D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Science and Technology with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2015-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103278D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1509.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2018.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |