VA HB2324 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Major information technology project procurement; terms and conditions; limitation of liability provisions. Requires, in any contract for a major information technology project, terms and conditions relating to the indemnification obligations and liability of a supplier to be reasonable and to not exceed in aggregate twice the value of the contract. The bill also provides that there is no limitation on the liability of a supplier for (i) any intentional or willful misconduct, fraud, or recklessness of a supplier or any employee of a supplier or (ii) claims for bodily injury, including death, and damage to real property or tangible personal property resulting from the negligence of a supplier or any employee of a supplier. The bill provides an exception to such conditions where the Secretary of Administration approves a reasonable maximum alternative limitation of liability amount recommended by the Chief Information Officer of the Commonwealth based on a risk assessment showing exceptional risk to the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to SB 1329.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Major information technology project procurement; terms and conditions, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0605)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 605 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2324ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (9-Y 2-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2324H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105482D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105482D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102823D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222012.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2324
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2324+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2324H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2324ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0605+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0008+HB2324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0076+HB2324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1984+HB2324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2030+HB2324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0110+HB2324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0337+HB2324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2324+HB2324
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0719HB2324+HB2324

Bill Comments

feedback