VA HB2327 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; unlicensed practice; cease and desist notices. Permits the Director of the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation, or his designee, to issue a notice to any person unlawfully engaging in unlicensed practice of an occupation to cease and desist such activity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DPOR; unlicensed practice, cease and desist notices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0481)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 481 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2327ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-14SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-14SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101680D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541111(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2327
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2327+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2327ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0481+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1101V0013+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1101V0019+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0081+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2158+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2232+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0120+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2327+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0657HB2327+HB2327
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2911+HB2327

Bill Comments

feedback