VA HB233 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assessments for affordable housing units. Provides that assessments for certain affordable housing units be done according to the income approach, based on the property's current use and restrictions. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission. The bill is effective for assessments for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2011.
Title
Affordable housing units; assessments.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Daniel Marshall [R] |
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0824) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 824 (effective 1/1/11) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB233ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB233ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Whipple agreed to | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB233H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104953D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104953D-H1 | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100870D |