VA HB2330 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Commission; financial viability and feasibility study prior to disbursement; Virginia Tobacco Region Revolving Fund. Renames the Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Commission as the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission (the Commission) and requires it to contract with a manager to oversee Commission loans, grants, and other distributions of money. The bill requires the manager to provide a written report on the financial viability and feasibility of any such distribution and prohibits the Commission from making the distribution until its viability and feasibility have received recommendations from the manager. The bill eliminates future appointments of three nonlegislative citizen members and requires 13 of the remaining 28 Commission members to have experience in particular fields. The bill requires the Commission to (i) adopt policies governing the Tobacco Region Opportunity Fund; (ii) require a dollar-for-dollar match from entities receiving grants; (iii) make no distribution to a tobacco-dependent community solely based on the historical production of tobacco; (iv) require each project to have an accountability matrix, provide a set of quantified outcome expectations and other figures, and demonstrate how it will address low employment levels or other indicators; (v) develop a strategic plan every two years; and (vi) establish a public database of awards. The bill also establishes the Virginia Tobacco Region Revolving Fund (the Fund), the assets of which are to be used to make loans to local governments for the financing of any project. The bill empowers the Virginia Resources Authority (the Authority) to administer the Fund, pledge assets of the Fund as security for bonds issued to finance a project, sell or collect on loans made from the Fund, and, in accordance with a memorandum of agreement with the Commission, establish the rates and terms of loans. The bill directs the Commission, in conjunction with the Authority, to make an annual report to the General Assembly and the Governor on all loans made from the Fund.
Title
Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission; created, financial viability & feasibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2330ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105155D-S1 (95-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2330S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105155D-S1 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105155D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 15104658D-EH1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2330EH1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Amendments by Delegate Kilgore agreed to |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104658D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104658D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103468D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1440 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0433)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 3100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |