VA HB2330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental Justice Advisory Council established; consideration for environmental justice. Establishes the Environmental Justice Advisory Council (the Council), consisting of 19 members, to advise the Governor on environmental justice in the Commonwealth through equitable development, implementation, evaluation, and enforcement of environmental laws, regulations, policies, and practices. The bill requires all state agencies to examine any new regulation or policy involving state action or funds in relation to its impact on environmental justice prior to adopting such regulation or policy and requires the Council to coordinate and lead efforts to achieve the Commonwealth's environmental justice goals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Justice Advisory Council; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Rules
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104162D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222699.11(n/a)See Bill Text
222699.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback