VA HB2331 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Wildlife Corridor Action Plan; Advisory Council. Directs the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries (the Department) to create a Wildlife Corridor Action Plan (the Plan) that assesses the connections between core habitat areas, lists potential projects to improve such connections, and provides an action plan for the completion of such projects. The bill requires the Department to submit the Plan, following review, to the Governor and General Assembly by July 1, 2020, and to update the action plan portion of the Plan every five years thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildlife Corridor Action Plan and Advisory Council; created, report.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Rules
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103741D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291578(n/a)See Bill Text
291579(n/a)See Bill Text
291580(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback