VA HB2332 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; protection of customer data. Requires the State Corporation Commission to convene and facilitate a Data Access Stakeholder group to review and consider certain elements of electric utility customer privacy considerations, including data sharing, protection of customers' personally identifiable information, opt-in/opt-out conditions for access to customers' utility usage data by the electric utility, and notice requirements by utilities to customers regarding energy usage data being collected. The measure requires the Data Access Stakeholder group to conclude its work no later than April 1, 2020, and report its recommendations to the General Assembly.
Title
Electric utilities; protection of customer data.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2332ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19107314D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2332S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107314D-S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107314D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2332H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106331D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106331D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104193D |