VA HB2334 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fish and Wildlife Commission established; report. Establishes the eight-member Fish and Wildlife Commission to review matters relating to freshwater and tidal fisheries and wildlife that have been referred to it by the legislative committees having jurisdiction over such subject matter. The Commission has a three-year sunset.
Title
Fish and Wildlife, Commission on; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (20-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101627D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Game, Inland Fisheries, and Boating
General Assembly
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports