VA HB2334 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Certain fraud crimes; forfeiture of motor vehicle. Provides that motor vehicles used in connection with an offense of obtaining money by false pretense, financial exploitation of mentally incapacitated persons, or construction fraud are subject to forfeiture to the Commonwealth upon conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fraud crimes, certain; forfeiture of motor vehicle.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2017-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote
2017-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 17103547D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192386.36(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback