VA HB2337 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; tuition and fee increases; public comment; report. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education, prior to a vote on an increase in undergraduate tuition or mandatory fees, to permit public comment on the proposed increase at a meeting of the governing board. The bill requires each such governing board to establish policies for such public comment, which may include reasonable time limitations. The bill requires each such governing board to provide, at any meeting at which it approves an increase in undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees, an explanation of any deviation from the project range of the planned increase in such tuition and fees that it previously provided to students and the public. The bill requires the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to provide to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations, the House Committee on Education, the Senate Committee on Education and Health, and the Senate Committee on Finance an annual report on any increase in undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees at a public institution of higher education, the public comment relating to such increase in undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees, and any deviation in the increase in undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees from the increase projected in the institutional six-year plan.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; governing boards, tuition and mandatory fee rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2337ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference substitute printed 19107663D-H2 |
2019-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Petersen, Norment, Newman |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Miyares, Landes, Bulova |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N 1-A) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19106934D-S2 (0-Y 96-N 1-A) |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2337S2 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106934D-S2 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 19106561D-S1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106934D-S2 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106561D-S1 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2337H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105554D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105554D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100762D |