VA HB2345 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance rates; minimum loss ratios. Codifies certain provisions that currently are set out in regulations adopted by the State Corporation Commission pertaining to the establishment of minimum loss ratios to assure that the benefits provided by accident and sickness insurance policies are or are likely to be reasonable in relation to the premiums charged. The measure authorizes the Commission, upon finding that a premium rate filed will not meet the originally filed and approved loss ratio, to require appropriate rate adjustments, premium refunds, or premium credits as necessary for the coverage to conform with established minimum loss ratio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual and certain group health benefit plans; rates for plans, minimum loss ratios.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0607)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 607 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2345ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2345H1
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105334D-H1
2019-01-25HouseRead second time
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105334D-H1
2019-01-22HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102654D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3821902(n/a)See Bill Text
3821904.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3824214(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2345
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2345+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2345H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2345ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0607+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1401V0003+HB2345
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0026+HB2345
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1920+HB2345
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0150+HB2345
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2345+HB2345
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2345+HB2345

Bill Comments

feedback